Senate | 04/23/2025 | Assigned to Education | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Arrive in Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa Davis | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Committee; 013-000-000 | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Committee | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |