Senate | 04/23/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |