House | 04/11/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 008-004-000 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Immigration & Human Rights Committee; by Voice Vote | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Immigration & Human Rights Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |