House | 04/11/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 012-000-000 | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A. Rosenthal | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber |