House | 04/11/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |