House | 04/23/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Assigned to Gaming Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Swanson |