Senate | 04/14/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Arrive in Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-037-000 | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martha Deuter | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicolle Grasse | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 006-003-000 | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |