House | 04/11/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 009-005-000 | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |