Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|