Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Crawford
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|