House
|
05/08/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Postponed - State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|