House
|
04/30/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Do Pass Insurance; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|