Senate | 04/10/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |