Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 9, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Assigned to Appropriations- Public Safety and Infrastructure | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |