House
|
04/23/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 037-019-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 017-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Postponed - Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|