House
|
04/30/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|