Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 9, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Postponed - Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Re-assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |