House
|
04/23/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Do Pass Health and Human Services; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Postponed - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|