House
|
05/07/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 039-016-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; D. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 005-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|