House | 05/01/2025 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Laura Faver Dias | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Arrived in House | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Resolution Adopted; 047-001-000 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 6, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Be Adopted Education; 013-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Filed with Secretary |