House
|
04/30/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A. Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges; 019-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason R. Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Resolution Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 6, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Be Adopted Transportation; 018-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Filed with Secretary
|
|
|