Illinois 2025-2026 Regular Session

Illinois Senate Bill SR0073

Introduced
1/31/25  
Refer
1/31/25  

Caption

MEMORIAL-CHARLESTER CROCKETT

Impact

While SR0073 is primarily a memorial statement, it serves to honor an individual who significantly impacted her community through her faith and dedication. By acknowledging the life of Charlester Crockett, the resolution contributes to the recognition of the contributions of women in the community, particularly those involved in faith-based organizations. It reflects the values of service, family, and community, which are significant within Illinois.

Summary

Senate Resolution SR0073 is a memorial resolution recognizing the life and contributions of Charlester Crockett, who passed away on January 20, 2025. The resolution highlights her dedication to her family, her role as a mentor, and her active participation in community and religious activities. It commemorates her efforts in advocating for voting rights and promoting healthy living practices.

Contention

The resolution does not specifically outline any contentious issues but is part of a tradition in the legislative process to memorialize and acknowledge individuals who have had a positive impact on society. The resolution's focus on Charlester Crockett's extensive contributions may spark discussions regarding the role of women in leadership within both community and religious contexts.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

IL SR0413

MEMORIAL-LINKA JONES

IL SR1027

MEMORIAL-VASILE CRICOVAN

IL SR0021

MEMORIAL-DANNY C. ALEXANDER

IL SR0053

MEMORIAL-THOMAS LEE KENNEDY

IL SR0925

MEMORIAL-JAMES KAMPE

IL SR1127

MEMORIAL-RONALD S. GOCZKOWSKI

IL SR1352

MEMORIAL-CONNIE MICHELICH

IL SR1024

MEMORIAL-KENNETH D. BRYAN

Similar Bills

TX SR191

Welcoming the citizens of Crockett County on the occasion of Crockett County Day.

TX SR460

Recognizing April 29, 2025, as Crockett County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR687

Recognizing February 24, 2015, as Crockett County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR292

Recognizing February 28, 2019, as Crockett County Day.

TX HR411

Recognizing February 28, 2019, as Crockett County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR452

Recognizing March 8, 2011, as Crockett County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR762

Commending the residents of Crockett County for their contributions to our state.

TX HR2107

In memory of Etta Crockett of Houston.