1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | Introduced Version |
---|
3 | 3 | | HOUSE BILL No. 1028 |
---|
4 | 4 | | _____ |
---|
5 | 5 | | DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL |
---|
6 | 6 | | Citations Affected: Noncode. |
---|
7 | 7 | | Synopsis: Student hunger and homelessness. Establishes the student |
---|
8 | 8 | | hunger and homelessness study committee (committee) for the |
---|
9 | 9 | | purposes of: (1) studying the prevalence of homelessness, housing |
---|
10 | 10 | | insecurity, and food insecurity among students at Indiana colleges and |
---|
11 | 11 | | universities during the 2022 academic year; and (2) providing |
---|
12 | 12 | | suggestions for eliminating these issues. Provides that the committee |
---|
13 | 13 | | must determine, as accurately as practicable, the number of Indiana |
---|
14 | 14 | | college and university students who are homeless, housing insecure, or |
---|
15 | 15 | | food insecure. Provides that the committee consists of: (1) an employee |
---|
16 | 16 | | of the family and social services administration; (2) an employee of the |
---|
17 | 17 | | department of child services; (3) an employee of the department of |
---|
18 | 18 | | education; (4) an employee of the commission for higher education; (5) |
---|
19 | 19 | | an employee of the Indiana housing and community development |
---|
20 | 20 | | authority; (6) a member of the commission on improving the status of |
---|
21 | 21 | | children in Indiana; and (7) an employee of each state educational |
---|
22 | 22 | | institution. Provides that the committee may solicit assistance from |
---|
23 | 23 | | private groups, colleges, and universities in performing the study. |
---|
24 | 24 | | Requires the committee to report the results of the study to the |
---|
25 | 25 | | governor and the legislative council not later than July 31, 2023. |
---|
26 | 26 | | Effective: July 1, 2022. |
---|
27 | 27 | | Harris |
---|
28 | 28 | | January 4, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative |
---|
29 | 29 | | Procedures. |
---|
30 | 30 | | 2022 IN 1028—LS 6209/DI 119 Introduced |
---|
31 | 31 | | Second Regular Session of the 122nd General Assembly (2022) |
---|
32 | 32 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
33 | 33 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
34 | 34 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
35 | 35 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
36 | 36 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
37 | 37 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
38 | 38 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
39 | 39 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
40 | 40 | | between statutes enacted by the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
41 | 41 | | HOUSE BILL No. 1028 |
---|
42 | 42 | | A BILL FOR AN ACT concerning higher education. |
---|
43 | 43 | | Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: |
---|
44 | 44 | | 1 SECTION 1. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2022] (a) The definitions in |
---|
45 | 45 | | 2 IC 21-7-13 apply throughout this SECTION. |
---|
46 | 46 | | 3 (b) As used in this SECTION, "committee" means the student |
---|
47 | 47 | | 4 hunger and homelessness study committee established by |
---|
48 | 48 | | 5 subsection (c). |
---|
49 | 49 | | 6 (c) The student hunger and homelessness study committee is |
---|
50 | 50 | | 7 established for the purposes of: |
---|
51 | 51 | | 8 (1) studying the prevalence of homelessness, housing |
---|
52 | 52 | | 9 insecurity, and food insecurity among students at Indiana |
---|
53 | 53 | | 10 colleges and universities; and |
---|
54 | 54 | | 11 (2) providing suggestions for eliminating the issues described |
---|
55 | 55 | | 12 in subdivision (1). |
---|
56 | 56 | | 13 (d) The committee is composed of the following members: |
---|
57 | 57 | | 14 (1) One (1) employee of the family and social services |
---|
58 | 58 | | 15 administration, appointed by the secretary of family and |
---|
59 | 59 | | 16 social services. |
---|
60 | 60 | | 17 (2) One (1) employee of the department of child services, |
---|
61 | 61 | | 18 appointed by the director of the department of child services. |
---|
62 | 62 | | 2022 IN 1028—LS 6209/DI 119 2 |
---|
63 | 63 | | 1 (3) One (1) employee of the department of education, |
---|
64 | 64 | | 2 appointed by the secretary of education. |
---|
65 | 65 | | 3 (4) One (1) employee of the commission for higher education, |
---|
66 | 66 | | 4 appointed by the commissioner of the commission for higher |
---|
67 | 67 | | 5 education. |
---|
68 | 68 | | 6 (5) One (1) employee of the Indiana housing and community |
---|
69 | 69 | | 7 development authority, appointed by the executive director of |
---|
70 | 70 | | 8 the Indiana housing and community development authority. |
---|
71 | 71 | | 9 (6) One (1) member of the commission on improving the |
---|
72 | 72 | | 10 status of children in Indiana, appointed by the chairperson of |
---|
73 | 73 | | 11 the commission on improving the status of children in |
---|
74 | 74 | | 12 Indiana. |
---|
75 | 75 | | 13 (7) One (1) employee of each state educational institution, |
---|
76 | 76 | | 14 appointed by the president of the state educational institution. |
---|
77 | 77 | | 15 The member appointed by the commissioner of the commission for |
---|
78 | 78 | | 16 higher education is the chair of the committee. |
---|
79 | 79 | | 17 (e) In conducting the study described in subsection (c), the |
---|
80 | 80 | | 18 committee shall: |
---|
81 | 81 | | 19 (1) establish standards by which homelessness, housing |
---|
82 | 82 | | 20 insecurity, and food insecurity are defined for purposes of the |
---|
83 | 83 | | 21 study; and |
---|
84 | 84 | | 22 (2) determine, as accurately as practicable, the number of |
---|
85 | 85 | | 23 individuals who: |
---|
86 | 86 | | 24 (A) are attending a college or university in Indiana in the |
---|
87 | 87 | | 25 academic year beginning in 2022; and |
---|
88 | 88 | | 26 (B) are homeless, housing insecure, or food insecure, as |
---|
89 | 89 | | 27 determined according to the standards established under |
---|
90 | 90 | | 28 subdivision (1). |
---|
91 | 91 | | 29 (f) The committee may solicit assistance from private entities for |
---|
92 | 92 | | 30 purposes of the study described in subsection (c), including the |
---|
93 | 93 | | 31 following: |
---|
94 | 94 | | 32 (1) The Indiana Institute for Working Families. |
---|
95 | 95 | | 33 (2) Private Indiana colleges and universities. |
---|
96 | 96 | | 34 (g) The committee shall meet at the call of the chair. |
---|
97 | 97 | | 35 (h) The commission for higher education shall staff and provide |
---|
98 | 98 | | 36 administrative support for the committee. |
---|
99 | 99 | | 37 (i) The committee shall: |
---|
100 | 100 | | 38 (1) prepare a written report setting forth the results of the |
---|
101 | 101 | | 39 study described in subsection (c); and |
---|
102 | 102 | | 40 (2) submit the written report: |
---|
103 | 103 | | 41 (A) to the governor; and |
---|
104 | 104 | | 42 (B) to the legislative council in an electronic format under |
---|
105 | 105 | | 2022 IN 1028—LS 6209/DI 119 3 |
---|
106 | 106 | | 1 IC 5-14-6; |
---|
107 | 107 | | 2 not later than July 31, 2023. |
---|
108 | 108 | | 3 (j) The affirmative votes of a majority of the members of the |
---|
109 | 109 | | 4 committee are required for the committee to take action on any |
---|
110 | 110 | | 5 measure, including a final report. |
---|
111 | 111 | | 6 (k) This SECTION expires December 31, 2023. |
---|
112 | 112 | | 2022 IN 1028—LS 6209/DI 119 |
---|