Introduced Version HOUSE BILL No. 1028 _____ DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL Citations Affected: Noncode. Synopsis: Student hunger and homelessness. Establishes the student hunger and homelessness study committee (committee) for the purposes of: (1) studying the prevalence of homelessness, housing insecurity, and food insecurity among students at Indiana colleges and universities during the 2022 academic year; and (2) providing suggestions for eliminating these issues. Provides that the committee must determine, as accurately as practicable, the number of Indiana college and university students who are homeless, housing insecure, or food insecure. Provides that the committee consists of: (1) an employee of the family and social services administration; (2) an employee of the department of child services; (3) an employee of the department of education; (4) an employee of the commission for higher education; (5) an employee of the Indiana housing and community development authority; (6) a member of the commission on improving the status of children in Indiana; and (7) an employee of each state educational institution. Provides that the committee may solicit assistance from private groups, colleges, and universities in performing the study. Requires the committee to report the results of the study to the governor and the legislative council not later than July 31, 2023. Effective: July 1, 2022. Harris January 4, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures. 2022 IN 1028—LS 6209/DI 119 Introduced Second Regular Session of the 122nd General Assembly (2022) PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts between statutes enacted by the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly. HOUSE BILL No. 1028 A BILL FOR AN ACT concerning higher education. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: 1 SECTION 1. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2022] (a) The definitions in 2 IC 21-7-13 apply throughout this SECTION. 3 (b) As used in this SECTION, "committee" means the student 4 hunger and homelessness study committee established by 5 subsection (c). 6 (c) The student hunger and homelessness study committee is 7 established for the purposes of: 8 (1) studying the prevalence of homelessness, housing 9 insecurity, and food insecurity among students at Indiana 10 colleges and universities; and 11 (2) providing suggestions for eliminating the issues described 12 in subdivision (1). 13 (d) The committee is composed of the following members: 14 (1) One (1) employee of the family and social services 15 administration, appointed by the secretary of family and 16 social services. 17 (2) One (1) employee of the department of child services, 18 appointed by the director of the department of child services. 2022 IN 1028—LS 6209/DI 119 2 1 (3) One (1) employee of the department of education, 2 appointed by the secretary of education. 3 (4) One (1) employee of the commission for higher education, 4 appointed by the commissioner of the commission for higher 5 education. 6 (5) One (1) employee of the Indiana housing and community 7 development authority, appointed by the executive director of 8 the Indiana housing and community development authority. 9 (6) One (1) member of the commission on improving the 10 status of children in Indiana, appointed by the chairperson of 11 the commission on improving the status of children in 12 Indiana. 13 (7) One (1) employee of each state educational institution, 14 appointed by the president of the state educational institution. 15 The member appointed by the commissioner of the commission for 16 higher education is the chair of the committee. 17 (e) In conducting the study described in subsection (c), the 18 committee shall: 19 (1) establish standards by which homelessness, housing 20 insecurity, and food insecurity are defined for purposes of the 21 study; and 22 (2) determine, as accurately as practicable, the number of 23 individuals who: 24 (A) are attending a college or university in Indiana in the 25 academic year beginning in 2022; and 26 (B) are homeless, housing insecure, or food insecure, as 27 determined according to the standards established under 28 subdivision (1). 29 (f) The committee may solicit assistance from private entities for 30 purposes of the study described in subsection (c), including the 31 following: 32 (1) The Indiana Institute for Working Families. 33 (2) Private Indiana colleges and universities. 34 (g) The committee shall meet at the call of the chair. 35 (h) The commission for higher education shall staff and provide 36 administrative support for the committee. 37 (i) The committee shall: 38 (1) prepare a written report setting forth the results of the 39 study described in subsection (c); and 40 (2) submit the written report: 41 (A) to the governor; and 42 (B) to the legislative council in an electronic format under 2022 IN 1028—LS 6209/DI 119 3 1 IC 5-14-6; 2 not later than July 31, 2023. 3 (j) The affirmative votes of a majority of the members of the 4 committee are required for the committee to take action on any 5 measure, including a final report. 6 (k) This SECTION expires December 31, 2023. 2022 IN 1028—LS 6209/DI 119