House
|
03/11/2022
|
Public Law 92
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 322: yeas 90, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senator Alting added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 282: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senator Becker added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senators Walker K, Glick, Sandlin, Freeman added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Bohacek and Brown L
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 45: yeas 85, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Representative Shackleford added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Coauthored by Representatives Errington and Schaibley
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Representative Negele
|
|
|