| 1 | + | *HB1079.1* |
---|
| 2 | + | January 13, 2022 |
---|
| 3 | + | HOUSE BILL No. 1079 |
---|
| 4 | + | _____ |
---|
| 5 | + | DIGEST OF HB 1079 (Updated January 12, 2022 1:04 pm - DI 140) |
---|
| 6 | + | Citations Affected: IC 35-42. |
---|
| 7 | + | Synopsis: Elements of rape. Provides that a person commits rape if: |
---|
| 8 | + | (1) the person engages in sexual activity with another person and the |
---|
| 9 | + | other person submits to the sexual activity under the belief that the |
---|
| 10 | + | person committing the act is someone the victim knows, other than the |
---|
| 11 | + | person committing the act, and such belief is intentionally induced by |
---|
| 12 | + | any artifice, pretense, or concealment practiced by the person; or (2) |
---|
| 13 | + | the person engages in sexual activity with another person and the other |
---|
| 14 | + | person has expressed a lack of consent, through words or conduct, to |
---|
| 15 | + | sexual intercourse or other sexual conduct. |
---|
| 16 | + | Effective: July 1, 2022. |
---|
| 17 | + | Negele, Errington, Schaibley |
---|
| 18 | + | January 4, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code. |
---|
| 19 | + | January 13, 2022, reported — Do Pass. |
---|
| 20 | + | HB 1079—LS 6196/DI 131 January 13, 2022 |
---|
15 | | - | SECTION 1. IC 35-42-4-1, AS AMENDED BY P.L.168-2014, |
---|
16 | | - | SECTION 67, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
17 | | - | JULY 1, 2022]: Sec. 1. (a) Except as provided in subsection (b), a |
---|
18 | | - | person who knowingly or intentionally has sexual intercourse with |
---|
19 | | - | another person or knowingly or intentionally causes another person to |
---|
20 | | - | perform or submit to other sexual conduct (as defined in |
---|
21 | | - | IC 35-31.5-2-221.5) when: |
---|
22 | | - | (1) the other person is compelled by force or imminent threat of |
---|
23 | | - | force; |
---|
24 | | - | (2) the other person is unaware that the sexual intercourse or other |
---|
25 | | - | sexual conduct (as defined in IC 35-31.5-2-221.5) is occurring; or |
---|
26 | | - | (3) the other person is so mentally disabled or deficient that |
---|
27 | | - | consent to sexual intercourse or other sexual conduct (as defined |
---|
28 | | - | in IC 35-31.5-2-221.5) cannot be given; or |
---|
29 | | - | (4) the person disregarded the other person's attempts to |
---|
30 | | - | physically, verbally, or by other visible conduct refuse the |
---|
31 | | - | person's acts; |
---|
32 | | - | commits rape, a Level 3 felony. |
---|
33 | | - | (b) An offense described in subsection (a) is a Level 1 felony if: |
---|
34 | | - | (1) it is committed by using or threatening the use of deadly force; |
---|
35 | | - | (2) it is committed while armed with a deadly weapon; |
---|
36 | | - | HEA 1079 — Concur 2 |
---|
37 | | - | (3) it results in serious bodily injury to a person other than a |
---|
38 | | - | defendant; or |
---|
39 | | - | (4) the commission of the offense is facilitated by furnishing the |
---|
40 | | - | victim, without the victim's knowledge, with a drug (as defined in |
---|
41 | | - | IC 16-42-19-2(1)) or a controlled substance (as defined in |
---|
42 | | - | IC 35-48-1-9) or knowing that the victim was furnished with the |
---|
43 | | - | drug or controlled substance without the victim's knowledge. |
---|
44 | | - | HEA 1079 — Concur Speaker of the House of Representatives |
---|
45 | | - | President of the Senate |
---|
46 | | - | President Pro Tempore |
---|
47 | | - | Governor of the State of Indiana |
---|
48 | | - | Date: Time: |
---|
49 | | - | HEA 1079 — Concur |
---|
| 35 | + | 1 SECTION 1. IC 35-42-4-1, AS AMENDED BY P.L.168-2014, |
---|
| 36 | + | 2 SECTION 67, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
| 37 | + | 3 JULY 1, 2022]: Sec. 1. (a) Except as provided in subsection (b), a |
---|
| 38 | + | 4 person who knowingly or intentionally has sexual intercourse with |
---|
| 39 | + | 5 another person or knowingly or intentionally causes another person to |
---|
| 40 | + | 6 perform or submit to other sexual conduct (as defined in |
---|
| 41 | + | 7 IC 35-31.5-2-221.5) when: |
---|
| 42 | + | 8 (1) the other person is compelled by force or imminent threat of |
---|
| 43 | + | 9 force; |
---|
| 44 | + | 10 (2) the other person is unaware that the sexual intercourse or other |
---|
| 45 | + | 11 sexual conduct (as defined in IC 35-31.5-2-221.5) is occurring; or |
---|
| 46 | + | 12 (3) the other person is so mentally disabled or deficient that |
---|
| 47 | + | 13 consent to sexual intercourse or other sexual conduct (as defined |
---|
| 48 | + | 14 in IC 35-31.5-2-221.5) cannot be given; |
---|
| 49 | + | 15 (4) the other person submits to the sexual intercourse or other |
---|
| 50 | + | 16 sexual conduct (as defined in IC 35-31.5-2-221.5) under the |
---|
| 51 | + | 17 belief that the person committing the act is someone the |
---|
| 52 | + | HB 1079—LS 6196/DI 131 2 |
---|
| 53 | + | 1 victim knows, other than the person committing the act, and |
---|
| 54 | + | 2 such belief is intentionally induced by any artifice, pretense, |
---|
| 55 | + | 3 or concealment practiced by the person; or |
---|
| 56 | + | 4 (5) the other person has expressed a lack of consent, through |
---|
| 57 | + | 5 words or conduct, to sexual intercourse or other sexual |
---|
| 58 | + | 6 conduct (as defined in IC 35-31.5-2-221.5); |
---|
| 59 | + | 7 commits rape, a Level 3 felony. |
---|
| 60 | + | 8 (b) An offense described in subsection (a) is a Level 1 felony if: |
---|
| 61 | + | 9 (1) it is committed by using or threatening the use of deadly force; |
---|
| 62 | + | 10 (2) it is committed while armed with a deadly weapon; |
---|
| 63 | + | 11 (3) it results in serious bodily injury to a person other than a |
---|
| 64 | + | 12 defendant; or |
---|
| 65 | + | 13 (4) the commission of the offense is facilitated by furnishing the |
---|
| 66 | + | 14 victim, without the victim's knowledge, with a drug (as defined in |
---|
| 67 | + | 15 IC 16-42-19-2(1)) or a controlled substance (as defined in |
---|
| 68 | + | 16 IC 35-48-1-9) or knowing that the victim was furnished with the |
---|
| 69 | + | 17 drug or controlled substance without the victim's knowledge. |
---|
| 70 | + | HB 1079—LS 6196/DI 131 3 |
---|
| 71 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 72 | + | Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Courts and Criminal Code, to |
---|
| 73 | + | which was referred House Bill 1079, has had the same under |
---|
| 74 | + | consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with |
---|
| 75 | + | the recommendation that said bill do pass. |
---|
| 76 | + | (Reference is to HB 1079 as introduced.) |
---|
| 77 | + | MCNAMARA |
---|
| 78 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 9, Nays 1 |
---|
| 79 | + | HB 1079—LS 6196/DI 131 |
---|