Senate | 02/02/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Cosponsor: Senator Ford Jon | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Senate sponsors: Senators Garten, Doriot, Messmer | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 61, nays 29 | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Amendment #1 (DeLaney) prevailed; Roll Call 111: yeas 92, nays 0 | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 84 | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Representatives Miller, Pressel, Jeter C added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Authored by Representative Bartels |