House
|
03/10/2022
|
Public Law 71
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senator Zay added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senator Brown L added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senator Doriot added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senator Leising added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 216: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Senator Yoder added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Koch
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 18: yeas 89, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Representative Frye added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Representative Pierce added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Manning
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Representative Soliday
|
|
|