Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1111 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Fiscal Note February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 17, 2022
Fiscal Note February 14, 2022
Fiscal Note January 18, 2022
Fiscal Note January 13, 2022
Bill January 11, 2022
Fiscal Note January 11, 2022
Bill January 3, 2022
Fiscal Note January 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill February 23, 2022

Amended

Bill February 23, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022
Bill January 11, 2022