House
|
03/18/2022
|
Public Law 163
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 325: yeas 75, nays 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senator Doriot added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senator Ford Jon added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senator Niezgodski removed as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 296: yeas 28, nays 20
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Glick
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 140: yeas 76, nays 13
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Amendment #3 (Boy) failed; Roll Call 113: yeas 27, nays 65
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Dvorak) failed; Roll Call 112: yeas 29, nays 63
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Soliday) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Representative Abbott D added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Representative Manning added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Representative Jackson added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Representative Soliday
|
|
|