Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1209 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 4, 2022
Fiscal Note March 1, 2022
Fiscal Note February 28, 2022
Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Fiscal Note February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note January 27, 2022
Fiscal Note January 26, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Fiscal Note January 19, 2022
Bill January 18, 2022
Fiscal Note January 5, 2022
Bill January 5, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 2, 2022

Amended

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill February 25, 2022
Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022
Bill January 24, 2022
Bill January 18, 2022