House
|
03/11/2022
|
Public Law 94
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 326: yeas 66, nays 25
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Representative Hamilton removed as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senator Brown L added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senator Doriot added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senator Donato added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senator Ford J.D. removed as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 33, nays 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Koch
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 59: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Pryor) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Representatives Negele and Hamilton added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Manning
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Representative Soliday
|
|
|