Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1221 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 3, 2022
Fiscal Note February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 18, 2022
Fiscal Note February 14, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Fiscal Note January 21, 2022
Fiscal Note January 19, 2022
Bill January 18, 2022
Bill January 5, 2022
Fiscal Note January 5, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022
Bill January 21, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2022

Amended

Bill February 17, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022
Bill January 18, 2022