House
|
03/18/2022
|
Public Law 165
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 350: yeas 49, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 361: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Carbaugh, Ellington, Schaibley and Campbell
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Lehman and Austin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Bassler and Griffin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Zay and Randolph Lonnie M
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senator Holdman added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 237: yeas 47, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Representative Austin added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Zay
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 60: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Carbaugh
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Representative Lehman
|
|
|