Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1238 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 10, 2022
Fiscal Note February 23, 2022
Fiscal Note February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 18, 2022
Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Fiscal Note January 20, 2022
Fiscal Note January 19, 2022
Bill January 18, 2022
Bill January 5, 2022
Fiscal Note January 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Amended

Bill March 8, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022
Bill January 18, 2022