House
|
03/10/2022
|
Public Law 77
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 238: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Senator Brown L added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Representatives Rowray E, Porter added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 90, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Representative Barrett
|
|
|