Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1254 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Fiscal Note February 23, 2022
Fiscal Note February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 17, 2022
Fiscal Note February 10, 2022
Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Fiscal Note January 21, 2022
Fiscal Note January 13, 2022
Bill January 5, 2022
Fiscal Note January 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill February 24, 2022

Amended

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022
Bill January 21, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022
Bill January 13, 2022