House
|
03/21/2022
|
Public Law 175
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 364: yeas 30, nays 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 382: yeas 69, nays 30
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senators Koch and Tomes added as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senators Ford Jon and Griffin removed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Smaltz added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Austin removed as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representatives Abbott D, Baird, Barrett, Bartels, Behning, Borders, Carbaugh, Cherry, Cook, Davis M, Davisson J., DeVon, Eberhart, Ellington, Engleman, Frye, Goodrich, Gutwein, Heaton, Heine, Hostettler, Huston, Jeter C, Jordan, Judy, King J, Lauer, Ledbetter C, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, Miller, Morris, Morrison, Payne Z, Prescott, Snow C, Steuerwald, Teshka J, Thompson, VanNatter, Vermilion A, Wesco, Young J added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rule 105.2 suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Smaltz added as author
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Carbaugh removed as author
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Walker K and Randolph Lonnie M
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Ford Jon and Griffin
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Lehman and Campbell
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Austin
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 304: yeas 47, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Senator Zay added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Ford Jon
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 145: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Authored by Representative Carbaugh
|
|
|