Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1296 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 10, 2022
Fiscal Note March 1, 2022
Fiscal Note February 24, 2022
Fiscal Note February 18, 2022
Fiscal Note January 31, 2022
Fiscal Note January 26, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Bill January 24, 2022
Bill January 7, 2022
Fiscal Note January 7, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Amended

Bill March 8, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022
Bill January 24, 2022