House
|
03/15/2022
|
Public Law 147
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 377: yeas 35, nays 15
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 397: yeas 68, nays 27
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senator Sandlin added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senator Taylor G removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senator Sandlin removed as advisor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Young J added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Porter removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Sandlin and Pol
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Freeman and Taylor G
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Steuerwald, McNamara, Smaltz and Austin
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Mayfield and Porter
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 256: yeas 35, nays 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment #3 (Taylor G) failed; Roll Call 227: yeas 13, nays 36
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Taylor G) failed; Roll Call 226: yeas 13, nays 36
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Freeman, Sandlin, Young M
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 66, nays 24
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #5 (Austin) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Young J) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #3 (Mayfield) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Mayfield) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Representative Schaibley added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Authored by Representative Mayfield
|
|
|