Senate | 02/25/2022 | Returned to the House | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Senate sponsor: Senator Alting | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Representative Klinker added as coauthor | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 169: yeas 96, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Representative Saunders added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | Authored by Representative Campbell |