Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Public Law 84
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 316: yeas 47, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 272: yeas 85, nays 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Torr) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Koch added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Behning, Speedy, Jeter C
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Torr
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 64: yeas 46, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Amendment #3 (Pol) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Walker K) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
Coauthored by Senators Sandlin and Freeman
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Senators Walker K, Crider and Young M
|
|
|