Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0009 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 3, 2022
Fiscal Note February 24, 2022
Fiscal Note February 23, 2022
Fiscal Note February 18, 2022
Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Fiscal Note January 21, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022
Fiscal Note December 29, 2021
Fiscal Note December 27, 2021
Bill December 27, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022
Bill January 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 2, 2022

Amended

Bill February 23, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022
Bill January 24, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022