Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Public Law 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 224: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Representative Bartels added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Jeter
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 39, nays 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Senator Freeman added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Senator Gaskill
|
|
|