Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0019 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 7, 2022
Fiscal Note February 22, 2022
Fiscal Note February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 17, 2022
Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Fiscal Note January 18, 2022
Bill January 13, 2022
Fiscal Note January 13, 2022
Bill December 16, 2021
Fiscal Note December 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill February 23, 2022

Amended

Bill February 23, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022
Bill January 13, 2022