House | 02/10/2022 | Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Cosponsor: Representative Vermilion A | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | House sponsor: Representative Barrett | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 102: yeas 31, nays 18 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Amendment #6 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | Senator Becker added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |