Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0088 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 1, 2022
Fiscal Note January 28, 2022
Fiscal Note January 21, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022
Bill December 27, 2021
Fiscal Note December 27, 2021

Engrossed

Bill January 27, 2022

Amended

Bill January 27, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022