Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Public Law 42
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 257: yeas 47, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 218: yeas 93, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Rogers added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Garten added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Buck added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Bohacek added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Brown L added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Doriot removed as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Schaibley, Carbaugh, Lehman
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Zent
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 50: yeas 46, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senator Koch removed as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Senator Bassler added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Senator Koch added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Senator Doriot added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Senator Zay
|
|
|