Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0136 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Fiscal Note February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 17, 2022
Fiscal Note February 15, 2022
Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Fiscal Note January 20, 2022
Fiscal Note January 13, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022
Bill December 30, 2021
Fiscal Note December 30, 2021

Enrolled

Bill February 25, 2022

Amended

Bill February 25, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022