House | 01/31/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | House sponsor: Representative Lehman | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 29: yeas 46, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Senator Zay added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Senator Kruse added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | Authored by Senator Raatz |